Fonger, James Douglas (CPSO#: 50575)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Sep 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Sep 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1978 to 18 Jun 1979
Other - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 May 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Sep 1996