Fonseca, Conchita Berta (CPSO#: 81160)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2nd Floor
1365 Richmond Road
Ottawa ON  K2B 6R7
Phone: (613) 820-2001
Fax: (613) 820-2006
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Public Health
179 Clarence St
Ottawa ON  K1N 1B3
Canada
Phone: (613) 234-4641
Fax: 613-560-6096
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CONCHITA BERTA FONSECA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FONSECA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007