Fontalvo Herazo, Lucia Fernanda (CPSO#: 78947)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidad El Bosque, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Apr 2003 to 27 May 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 28 May 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016