Fontes Pedra, Simone Rolim Fernandes (CPSO#: 73085)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Faculdade de Ciencias Medicas de Santos, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Sep 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1999