Foote, John Ramsay (CPSO#: 66589)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Emergency Department
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5058
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

500 University Avenue
Suite 300
M5G 1V7
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Canada
Phone: (416) 978-1019
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John R. Foote Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Foote ( CPSO# 66589 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Emergency Department
Suite 206
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5058

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN RAMSAY FOOTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOOTE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1995