Forbes, Colin Edward (CPSO#: 47019)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Apr 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Apr 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Swahili

Education:McGill University, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 32 211 Pine Valley Drive London, ON N6J 4W5
Date Received: 29 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Nov 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Armed Forces Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1956
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Feb 1958
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Apr 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 7, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the voluntary cease-to-practise Undertaking given by Dr. Colin Edward Forbes to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 7, 2015:

Dr. Forbes has ceased to practise medicine due to retirement and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.