Forbes, Nikkiah Meoshi (CPSO#: 105103)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 13 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2014 to 16 Nov 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 16 Nov 2015 to 29 Nov 2015
PEAP - Resident - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 30 Nov 2015 to 13 Dec 2015
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Nov 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Dec 2015