Forbes, Shauna Elaine (CPSO#: 63974)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: Tallan, Shauna Elaine (used until: 25 Jun 1992 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 308
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone: (416) 283-7701
Fax: (416) 283-7108
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAUNA ELAINE FORBES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORBES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1992