Forcina, Alexander Erasmo (CPSO#: 65207)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
602 Caledonia Road
Toronto ON  M6E 4V5
Phone: (416) 782-2211
Fax: (416) 782-2392
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alexander E. Forcina Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Forcina ( CPSO# 65207 )

Business Address:
602 Caledonia Road
Toronto ON  M6E 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 782-2211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER ERASMO FORCINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORCINA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993