Ford, David Charles Seymour (CPSO#: 68914)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Gastro Health Clinic
Suite 250
4600 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone: (905) 856-6797
Fax: (905) 856-6790
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Vaughan Endoscopy Clinic
4610 Highway 7
Suite 200
Vaughan ON  L4L 4Y7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Toronto Digestive Disease Associate
4600 Highway 7
Suite 225
Vaughan ON  L4L 4Y7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke Campus
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto ON  M9V 4B8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Campus
2100 Bovaird Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Ford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ford ( CPSO# 68914 )

Business Address:
William Olser Health Centre - Etobicoke Campus
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3500

Business Address:
Gastro Health Clinic
Unit 250
4600 Highway 7
Vaughan ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone Number: (416) 743-8431

Business Address:
Toronto Digestive Disease Associates
225 - 4600 Highway 7
Vaughan ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone Number: (416) 650-0017

Business Address:
Vaughan Endoscopy Clinic
200 - 4610 Highway 7
Vaughan ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone Number: (905) 856-2626

Business Address:
William Olser Health Centre - Brampton Campus
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (416) 747-3500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 26 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID CHARLES SEYMOUR FORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2000