Ford, Jacqueline (CPSO#: 24427)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 201 60 Hatt Street Dundas, ON L9H 7T6
Date Received: 13 Aug 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 24 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 2014