Ford, Jason Cyrus (CPSO#: 69922)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001