Ford, Meredith Katherine (CPSO#: 77781)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7628
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M.K. Ford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ford ( CPSO# 77781 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7628

Business Address:
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 259-6671

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEREDITH KATHERINE FORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 04 Apr 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008