Ford, Michael Henry Gerrard (CPSO#: 33052)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite M G 375
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6775
Fax: (416) 480-5990
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. H. Ford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ford ( CPSO# 33052 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite MG-375
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6775

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL HENRY GERRARD FORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1980 to 16 Jun 1981
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Research Fellows - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Aug 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 1985