Ford-Jones, Elizabeth Lee (CPSO#: 29111)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: Pearson, Elizabeth Lee (used until: 17 Feb 1985 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital For Sick Children
Social Pediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5443
Fax: (416) 813-5032
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anthony Ford-Jones Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ford-Jones ( CPSO# 28110 )
Dr. E. Ford-Jones ( CPSO# 29111 )

Business Address:
Suite 103, Unit 10-14
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone Number: (905) 634-1311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 14 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH LEE FORD-JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORD-JONES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Sep 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1981