Forestell, Gerald Patrick (CPSO#: 62093)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 May 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Suite 104
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone: (705) 789-2355
Fax: (705) 789-1051
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gerald Forestell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Forestell ( CPSO# 62093 )

Business Address:
104 - 348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone Number: (705) 789-2355

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERALD PATRICK FORESTELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORESTELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 1993