Forget, Robert (CPSO#: 23424)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Apr 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 06 Apr 1989

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Smyth Medical Building
214-1929 Russell Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 4G3
Phone: (613) 521-6356
Fax: (613) 521-6330
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 31 Oct 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1989
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 06 Apr 1989

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 06 Apr 1989 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Robert Forget is prohibited from practising surgery in the Province of
            Ontario.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Oct 1990
Summary:

 In October 1990, Dr. Forget pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 
 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of 
 practice of the profession.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Forget 
 guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee imposed the following 
 penalty:

1.	Dr. Forget was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on 
 the Register; 

2.	Dr. Forget was to complete the evaluation of his ability to practice medical 
 orthopaedics in a manner safe to the public, as ordered by the Corporation professionnelle des 
 médicins du Québec; 

3.	Dr. Forget was to provide to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
 Ontario written authorization to obtain from the Corporation professionnelle des médicins du 
 Québec particulars of the evaluation made of his ability to practice medical orthopaedics in a 
 manner safe to the public, all recommendations made respecting a program of improvement, and 
 copies of any reports prepared for the Corporation following such an evaluation.  It was further 
 ordered that, should Dr. Forget fail to meet these requirements by 1 February 1991, then his 
 licence to practice medicine in Ontario would be suspended for six months; and 

4.	A restriction 
 was to be placed on Dr. Forget's licence, permanently prohibiting him from practicing surgery in 
 the Province of Ontario.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 10 Oct 1990

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 2, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)