Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Forgie, Melissa Anne (CPSO#: 63619)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus, 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 71056
Fax: (613) 737-8861
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 15 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA ANNE FORGIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORGIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1992