Forkert, Lutz (CPSO#: 24326)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 08 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Forkert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 27 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 102 Stuart Street Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Date Received: 07 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 25 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Apr 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Apr 2017