Fornasier, Frank Peter (CPSO#: 62877)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Feb 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Feb 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1230 North Shore Blvd
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone: 9056323737 Ext. 1243
Fax: (905) 681-4964
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frank Fornasier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Fornasier ( CPSO# 62877 )

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANK PETER FORNASIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORNASIER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Aug 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2006