Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Fornazzari, Ximena (CPSO#: 50578)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Oct 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Chile, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions - 28 Eugene St. Toronto, ON M6B 3Z4 Tel: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 09 Sep 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 04 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Oct 2015