Forrest, Christopher Robert (CPSO#: 52568)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital For Sick Children
Room 5430
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-8659
Fax: (416) 813-6637
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ROBERT FORREST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORREST is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Research Fellows - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1984