Forse, Monique Simms (CPSO#: 50580)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
377 Church Street #310
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 472-5900
Fax: (905) 472-2004
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. and M. Forse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Forse ( CPSO# 50579 )
Dr. M. Forse ( CPSO# 50580 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Health Centre
Suite 310
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 472-5900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONIQUE SIMMS FORSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORSE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1985