Forson, Thomas Eugene (CPSO#: 25509)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ghana

Education:University of Dublin, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas Forson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Forson ( CPSO# 25509 )

Business Address:
Chateau Gardens
105 Military Rd Hwy. 34
Lancaster ON  K0C 1N0
Phone Number: (613) 347-3016

Business Address:
Akwesasne Medical Clinic
PO Box 579
Akwesasne ON  K6H 5T3
Phone Number: (613) 575-2020

Business Address:
Tsiionkwanonhsoite
70 Kawehnoke Apartment Road
Akwesasne ON  K6H 5R7
Phone Number: (613) 932-1409

Business Address:
31 Fourth Street East
Cornwall ON  K6H 2H7
Phone Number: (613) 938-8333

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients shoulld contact Dr. Forson by telephone at: 613-935-8209, to request a copy of their medical record.
Date Received: 12 Oct 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2018