Fort, Diana Kathleen (CPSO#: 78738)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 17 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Nov 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 25 May 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2004
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 17 Nov 2006