Fort, Stephen (CPSO#: 69487)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Leeds, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 13 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 03 Apr 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 03 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 2003