Forte, Milena (CPSO#: 72748)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
60 Murray Street
4th Floor Box 25
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 3190
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Forte Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Forte ( CPSO# 72748 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
60 Murray Street
4th Floor
Box 25
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-3190

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MILENA FORTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2000