Fortier, Guylaine (CPSO#: 58902)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2002


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre de Sante et de Services
Socieux de la Vallee de l'or
725 6E Rue
Val d'or QC  J9P 3Y1
Phone: (819) 825-5858

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002