Fortier, Marielle Valerie (CPSO#: 68253)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 May 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
K.K.Women's and Children's Hospital
100 Bukit Timah Road
Singapore
Singapore 229899
Singapore
Phone: +6563942284
Fax: +6563942258
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marielle V. Fortier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 15 2009

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Singapore

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIELLE VALERIE FORTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORTIER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 1996