Fortier, Pierre (CPSO#: 45434)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Medisys Health Group Suite 210 1545 Carling Avenue Ottawa, ON K1Z 8P9
Date Received: 20 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015