Fortin, Dalilah (CPSO#: 79367)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Campus
Div of Crit Care & Thoracic Surgery
Suite E2 120
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8777
Fax: (519) 685-8778
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dalilah Fortin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fortin ( CPSO# 79367 )

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital
Room E2-120
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DALILAH FORTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORTIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 8 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2005