Fortin, Dominique (CPSO#: 62396)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Laval University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 15 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1990 to 30 Nov 1990
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1990