Fortin, Paul Joseph-Robert (CPSO#: 67361)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pavillon CHUL TR-93
2705 boulevard Laurier
Quebec City QC  G1V 2L9
Phone: (418) 654-2178
Fax: (418) 654-2142
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul R. Fortin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 24 2012

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 05 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL JOSEPH-ROBERT FORTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORTIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1993