Fossey, Susan Mary (CPSO#: 87398)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Ireland, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 19 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2008 to 19 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2009 to 19 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2010 to 19 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2011 to 19 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2012 to 21 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 22 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013