Foster, Christine Frances (CPSO#: 107301)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Columbia University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 9055259140
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Foster and Robbins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Robbins ( CPSO# 51693 )
Dr. M. Foster ( CPSO# 29909 )
Dr. L. Foster ( CPSO# 99495 )
Dr. C. Foster ( CPSO# 107301)

Business Address:
Suite 103
2200 Farview Street
Burlington ON  L7R 4H9
Phone Number: (905) 639-0884

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE FRANCES FOSTER shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. FOSTER is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. FOSTER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. FOSTER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. FOSTER shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. FOSTER is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. FOSTER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 17 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 18 Sep 2017 to 23 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018