Foster, Deborah Lynette (CPSO#: 89704)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2008 to 08 Aug 2008
Elective Trainee - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 09 Aug 2008 to 22 Aug 2008
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 03 Nov 2008 to 14 Nov 2008
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History