Foster, Heather Phyllis Marina (CPSO#: 33038)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jan 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 219
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 696-0003
Fax: (416) 696-0022
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER PHYLLIS MARINA FOSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOSTER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1982