Foster, Jennifer Ruth (CPSO#: 79253)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
IWK Health Centre
Division of Paediatric Critical Car
4th floor link
5850/5980 University Avenue
Halifax NS  B3K 6R8
Phone: (902) 470-8031
Fax: (902) 470-7425
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JR Foster Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 2 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER RUTH FOSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOSTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2007