Foster, Kenneth Daniel (CPSO#: 54517)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Apr 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Parry Sound Health Centre
6 Albert St
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone: (705) 746-4540 Ext. 2422
Fax: (705) 773-4632
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ken Foster Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Foster ( CPSO# 54517 )

Business Address:
West Parry Sound Health Centre
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone Number: (705) 746-4540

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 15 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH DANIEL FOSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOSTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 1988