Foster, Kimberley Jayne (CPSO#: 71135)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: Wallace, Kimberley Jayne (used until: 03 Oct 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2004