Foster, Stephen James (CPSO#: 29672)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Oct 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:McMaster University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Angola

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN JAMES FOSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOSTER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1977