Found, Margaret Helen (CPSO#: 59377)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dorval Medical
Family Health Team
465 Morden Road
Suite 104
Oakville ON  L6K 3W6
Phone: (905) 842-7154
Fax: (905) 842-3604
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Found Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Found ( CPSO# 59377 )
Dr. R. Southey ( CPSO# 52383 )

Business Address:
104 - 465 Morden Road
Oakville ON  L6K 3W6
Phone Number: (905) 842-7154


Corporation Name: Southey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Found ( CPSO# 59377 )
Dr. R. Southey ( CPSO# 52383 )

Business Address:
Dorval Medical Associates
Suite 104
465 Morden Road
Oakville ON  L6K 3W6
Phone Number: (905) 842-7154

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET HELEN FOUND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOUND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1989