Fountas, Panayiotis Nikolas (CPSO#: 50582)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Athens, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
833 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E8
Phone: (416) 467-6555
Fax: (416) 467-6474
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

106-2130 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1R 3A6
Canada
Phone: (647) 351-6646
Fax: (647) 351-6648
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

837 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1L2
Canada
Phone: (416) 465-5464
Fax: (416) 465-0445
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fountas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Fountas ( CPSO# 50582 )

Business Address:
833 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E8
Phone Number: (416) 467-6555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 07 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PANAYIOTIS NIKOLAS FOUNTAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOUNTAS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1984