Fournier, Annick Valerie (CPSO#: 70950)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Nov 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Montreal, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Department of Ophthalmology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-2235
Fax: (613) 738-4237
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University of Ottawa
Eye Institute
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8575
Fax: (613) 738-4237
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Annick V. Fournier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fournier ( CPSO# 70950 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Ophthalmology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Eye Institute
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNICK VALERIE FOURNIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOURNIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 1997 to 09 Mar 1997
Elective Trainee - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2000