Fournier, Renee (CPSO#: 55214)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Renee Fournier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Strathroy Medical Clinic 74 Front Street East Strathroy, Ontario N7G 1Y7 Tel: (519) 245- 0430
Date Received: 17 Jun 2010

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017