Foussias, George (CPSO#: 81176)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH
Room 738
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 34390
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE FOUSSIAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOUSSIAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009