Fowler, Jack Edward George (CPSO#: 28384)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 01 Mar 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1976
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 21 Sep 1990
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 01 Mar 1991

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Jan 1991
Summary:

 In January 1991, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Fowler guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he contravened while engaged in the 
 practice of medicine a federal,  provincial, or municipal law, regulation, or rule, or a by-law of 
 a hospital designed to protect the public health, contrary to s. 27(20); in that he failed to 
 provide within a reasonable time and without cause a report or certificate requested by a patient 
 or his authorized agent in respect of an examination or treatment performed by him, contrary to s. 
 27(27); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
 having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable, or unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32).  The Committee further found Dr. Fowler 
 incompetent, as defined in s. 60(4) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that he 
 displayed in his professional care of a patient a lack of knowledge, skill, or judgment or 
 disregard for the welfare of the patient of a nature or to an extent that demonstrates he is unfit 
 to continue in practice.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Fowler's licence to 
 practice medicine be revoked.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 09 Jan 1991