Fowler, Peter John (CPSO#: 20745)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1967
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 12 Feb 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 2013