Fowler, Sharyle Anne (CPSO#: 87557)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 14 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 13 Aug 2007 to 24 Aug 2007
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 25 Aug 2007 to 07 Sep 2007
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010