Fowlow, Geoffrey Neil (CPSO#: 44760)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Mar 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Mar 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The C M D Building
155 - 157 Main Road
P O Box 220
Arnold's Cove NL  A0B 1A0
Phone: (709) 463-2603
Fax: (709) 463-2089

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEOFFREY NEIL FOWLOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOWLOW is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1999